Dogfen lywodraethu SOLACE WOMEN'S AID
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/05/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/12/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/05/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/02/2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 05/12/2013 as amended on 06 Sep 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE RELIEF OF NEED BY THE PROMOTION OF THE PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL WELL-BEING AND SAFETY OF VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC, SEXUAL AND ASSOCIATED ABUSE, IN PARTICULAR WOMEN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.