Dogfen lywodraethu COMMUNITY FOSTER CARE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/02/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/12/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/09/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 JAN 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 APR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE: I) TO OPERATE A FOSTER CARE AGENCY IN THE UK REGARDING TRAINING AND APPROVING FOSTER CARERS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FROM SOCIAL AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED AREAS. II) TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN NEED AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE IN THE CARE OF, OR ACCOMMODATED BY, A LOCAL AUTHORITY BY: 1. PROVIDING THEM WITH, OR OTHERWISE ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF, A PLACEMENT OR PLACEMENTS IN SUITABLE ACCOMMODATION AND PROVIDING THEM WITH, OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF, FOSTER CARERS WITH THE AIM OF PROVIDING THEM WITH A STABLE FAMILY LIFE: 2. PROVIDING FOR THEIR EDUCATION AND ESTABLISHMENT IN LIFE. III) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND IN PARTICULAR THE ASSISTANCE OF ADULTS WHO HAVE AS CHILDREN BEEN IN LOCAL AUTHORITY CARE.
Maes buddion
THE UNITED KINGDOM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.