Dogfen lywodraethu NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR GALLERY EDUCATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 APRIL 2001D AS AMENDED 18 NOVEMBER 2004 AND 22 NOVEMBER 2007 as amended on 28 Jan 2021 as amended on 15 Nov 2023 as amended on 22 Nov 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION, ESPECIALLY VISUAL EDUCATION, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND WORKSHOP FACILITIES IN GALLERY EDUCATION. (B) TO UNDERTAKE PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF GALLERY EDUCATION AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULT OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.