Dogfen lywodraethu TIVERTON UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 SEPTEMBER 1998, AS AMENDED 25 JANUARY 2001, AS AMENDED 24 JANUARY 2002, AS AMENDED 28 FEBRUARY 2002, AS AMENDED 27 NOVEMBER 2003, AS AMENDED ON 23 MAR 2017 as amended on 27 May 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE NOT IN GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT WHO ARE IN THEIR THIRD AGE (BEING THE PERIOD OF TIME AFTER THE FIRST AGE OF CHILDHOOD DEPENDENCE AND THE SECOND AGE OF FULL TIME EMPLOYMENT AND/OR PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITY) RESIDING IN TIVERTON, DEVON AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Maes buddion
TIVERTON AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.