SMALL DOLE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
TO EXIST AS A BODY OF CHRISTIAN BELIEVERS BASED IN SMALL DOLE ENGAGING IN THE WORSHIP OF GOD AND THE FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. FROM TIME TO TIME UNDERTAKE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED, AGED OR SICK.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2007
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Gorllewin Sussex
Llywodraethu
- 27 Tachwedd 2000: Cofrestrwyd
- 12 Mawrth 2009: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £17.09k | £6.29k | £7.01k | £6.79k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £17.46k | £6.43k | £6.54k | £8.53k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2008 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2008 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2007 | 31 Ionawr 2008 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2007 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2006 | 27 Mawrth 2007 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2006 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2005 | 16 Mawrth 2006 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2005 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2004 | 05 Ebrill 2005 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2004 | 05 Ebrill 2005 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 NOVEMBER 2000.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN WEST SUSSEX AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Maes buddion
WEST SUSSEX, AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM, OR THE WORLD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window