THE BARROW-IN-FURNESS HAWCOAT (E) TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
This Charity is a part of the National Townswomen's Guild. We are a small group and mainly raise funds for other local charities by coffee evenings, raffles and proceeds from our social events. Our main activity is for social reasons.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 January 2011
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Hamdden
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Darparu Cyllid Arall
- Cumbria
Llywodraethu
- 16 Gorffennaf 2002: Cofrestrwyd
- 16 Chwefror 2012: Tynnwyd (DILEU GWIRFODDOL)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/01/2007 | 31/01/2008 | 31/01/2009 | 31/01/2010 | 31/01/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £6.06k | £5.54k | £5.57k | £5.93k | £4.14k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £6.49k | £4.79k | £5.33k | £5.66k | £4.53k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Ionawr 2012 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Ionawr 2012 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Ionawr 2011 | 20 Hydref 2011 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Ionawr 2011 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Ionawr 2010 | 08 Hydref 2010 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Ionawr 2010 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Ionawr 2009 | 12 Hydref 2009 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Ionawr 2009 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MAY 2000
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR SUCH PURPOSES GENERALLY AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND MORE SPECIFICALLY (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING): - 1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF WOMEN IRRESPECTIVE OF RACE CREED AND PARTY SO AS TO ENABLE THEM TO MAKE THE BEST CONTRIBUTION TOWARDS THE COMMON GOOD. 2. TO EDUCATE SUCH WOMEN IN THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND IN ALL PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY CARRYING OUT RESEARCH INTO ANY PUBLIC QUESTIONS WHETHER LOCAL NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. 4. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF ANY SUBJECT OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE WHERE WOMEN HAVE PARTICULAR KNOWLEDGE OR EXPERIENCE. 5. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR SUCH WOMEN IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Maes buddion
HAWCOAT, CUMBRIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window