THE SHANKLIN (E) TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
We meet the 3rd Wednesday each month 7.30pm to 9.45p.m. For our main meeting with info of our sub sections 1st (Social Studies, Handicraft, Home craft, Music, Leisure and Outings) each of these is also once a month , we then have Fellowship (news of anyone ill or injured) Newsletter (any good news to shout about) and the guest speaker of the month, is followed by monthly competitons.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 January 2011
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Anabledd
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Cymorth Dramor/cymorth I’r Newynog
- Llety/tai
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Anifeiliaid
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Cyllid Arall
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Ynys Wyth
Llywodraethu
- 25 Tachwedd 2000: Cofrestrwyd
- 12 Rhagfyr 2012: Tynnwyd (DILEU GWIRFODDOL)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/01/2007 | 31/01/2008 | 31/01/2009 | 31/01/2010 | 31/01/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £8.19k | £15.25k | £8.97k | £8.41k | £15.75k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £7.07k | £15.08k | £8.86k | £8.99k | £16.61k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Ionawr 2012 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Ionawr 2012 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Ionawr 2011 | 28 Tachwedd 2011 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Ionawr 2011 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Ionawr 2010 | 11 Hydref 2010 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Ionawr 2010 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Ionawr 2009 | 09 Medi 2009 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Ionawr 2009 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 APRIL 2000
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR SUCH PURPOSES GENERALLY AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND MORE SPECIFICALLY (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING):- 1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF WOMEN IRRESPECTIVE OF RACE CREED AND PARTY SO AS TO ENABLE THEM TO MAKE THE BEST CONTRIBUTION TOWARDS THE COMMON GOOD. 2. TO EDUCATE SUCH WOMEN IN THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND IN ALL PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY CARRYING OUT RESEARCH INTO ANY PUBLIC QUESTIONS WHETHER LOCAL NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL, AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. 4. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF ANY SUBJECT OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE WHERE WOMEN HAVE PARTICULAR KNOWLEDGE OR EXPERIENCE. 5. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR SUCH WOMEN IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window