Dogfen lywodraethu RAND EUROPE UK LIMITED

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/12/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/10/2001 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/08/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/01/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25/06/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS CONNECTED WITH THE DEVELOPMENT OF SOCIETY INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, TRANSPORT, HEALTH, EDUCATION, TECHNOLOGY, INTERNATIONAL RELATIONS AND SECURITY. 2. THE CONDUCT, PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF RESEARCH INTO MATTERS CONNECTED WITH THE DEVELOPMENT OF SOCIETY INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, TRANSPORT, HEALTH, EDUCATION, TECHNOLOGY, INTERNATIONAL RELATIONS AND SECURITY, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.