Dogfen lywodraethu EDUCATION BUSINESS SOLUTIONS LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 MARCH 2000 AS AMENDED, 24 JULY 2000, 26 FEBRUARY 2002. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 FEBRUARY 2007, AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATE 27 MAY 2010
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO THE DEVELOPMENT OF COMMERCIAL BUSINESS SKILLS AND METHODS AND OTHER RELATED MATTERS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO ENCOURAGE THEIR FUTURE INTEREST IN A CAREER IN INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.