NICRO UK TRUST FOR A SAFER SOUTH AFRICA
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The charity raises money in the UK to support the work in South Africa of NICRO - The National Institute for Crime Prevention and Re-Integration of Offenders. It primarily supports one specific scheme run by NICRO, namely, their youth diversion programmes of activities designed to help young people avoid being sent to prison when first appearing in court.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2008
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Cymru A Lloegr
- De Affrica
Llywodraethu
- 29 Tachwedd 2001: Cofrestrwyd
- 12 Chwefror 2010: Tynnwyd (TROSGLWYDDO CRONFEYDD)
- NICRO UK TRUST (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £37.55k | £24.01k | £21.80k | £6.15k | £11.07k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £12.07k | £5.81k | £17.68k | £1.66k | £28.04k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2009 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2009 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2008 | 27 Chwefror 2009 | 27 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2008 | 27 Chwefror 2009 | 27 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2007 | 15 Tachwedd 2007 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2007 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2006 | 30 Hydref 2006 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2006 | 30 Hydref 2006 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2005 | 17 Chwefror 2006 | 17 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2005 | 17 Chwefror 2006 | 17 diwrnod yn hwyr |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18TH DECEMBER 2000, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 25TH OCTOBER 2001
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND GREATER PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN THE PREVENTION AND SOLUTION OF CRIME; 2. TO PROMOTE THE PROTECTION OF PEOPLE AND PROPERTY FROM, AND THE PREVENTION OF, CRIMINAL ACTS, IN PARTICULAR BY ASSISTING THE POLICE AND OTHER BODIES IN MEASURES DESIGNED TO REDUCE THE LEVEL OF CRIME; 3. TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED THE SAME AS A RESULT OF A CRIMINAL OFFENCE AND AMONG THE FAMILIES OF SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED; 4. TO PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION AND RESETTLEMENT OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING, HAVE SUFFERED OR ARE IN DANGER OF SUFFERING A LEGAL RESTRICTION ON THEIR LIBERTY; 5. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE, IN MATTERS RELATED TO CRIME; AND 6. TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window