Dogfen lywodraethu KING EDWARD VI SCHOOL SOUTHAMPTON
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/06/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/12/2012 as amended on 12 Dec 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN OR NEAR SOUTHAMPTON AND ELSEWHERE, INCLUDING THE CARRYING ON OF A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS AND ANCILLARY OR INCIDENTAL EDUCATIONAL OR OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Maes buddion
IN OR NEAR SOUTHAMPTON
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.