Dogfen lywodraethu THE FRIENDS OF POCKLINGTON ARTS CENTRE
Rhif yr elusen: 1086300

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 FEB 2001 AS AMENDED ON 23 APR 2001 AS AMENDED ON 21 MAY 2001 AS AMENDED ON 07 JUN 2004 AS AMENDED ON 11 JUN 2013 AS AMENDED ON 14 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED ON 26 JUN 2017 as amended on 25 Jul 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE IMPROVE AND MAINTAIN THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS PARTICULARLY THE ARTS OF DRAMA MUSIC DANCE AND FILM AND TO SUPPORT THE PROVISION OF IMPROVED FACILITIES AT OAK HOUSE THROUGH THE ACTIVITIES OF THE FRIENDS
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.