Dogfen lywodraethu YAD VOEZER DAY CENTRE LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29TH MARCH 1995 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 1ST APRIL 2001, 11 AUGUST 2008 AND 11TH AUGUST 2008 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 JUL 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY, ONLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, FOR THE SUPPORT AND ADVANCEMENT OF PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITIES AND ASSOCIATED MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY PROVIDING, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, EDUCATION, TRAINING, WORKSHOPS, ACTIVITIES, AND ALL OTHER NECESSARY SUPPORT, IN EACH CASE DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO LIVE IN DIGNITY, REACH THEIR TRUE POTENTIAL AND LIVE AS INDEPENDENTLY AS POSSIBLE. 2.2. NOTHING IN THESE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY STATUTORY PROVISION REGARDING THE MEANING OF THE WORD "CHARITABLE" OR THE WORDS "CHARITABLE PURPOSES" IN FORCE IN ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.