Y Gofrestr Elusennau - Y Comisiwn Elusennau ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST BEDS CHILDS HELATH DIRECTORATE FUND

Rhif yr elusen: 1053793-32
Elusen gysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30/09/1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 01/11/2000 AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 13/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 29/03/2010 as amended on 06 Mar 2018 as amended on 17 Sep 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
APPLY THE INCOME AND AT THEIR DISCRETION SO FAR AS MAY BE PERMISSIBLE THE CAPITAL FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NHS WHOLLY OR MAINLY FOR THE CHILD HEALTH SERVICE AT ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Hanes cofrestru
  • 10 Ebrill 2001: Cofrestrwyd
Enwau eraill
  • BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON MENTAL HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST BEDS CHILDS HEALTH DIRECTORATE FUND (Enw blaenorol)
  • BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON COMMUNITY NHS TRUST BEDS CHILDS HEALTH DIRECTORATE FUND (Enw blaenorol)
  • SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS TRUST BEDS CHILDS HELATH DIRECTORATE FUND (Enw blaenorol)
Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â