Dogfen lywodraethu JOHN STORER CHARNWOOD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/02/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/11/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/12/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/11/2012 as amended on 12 Oct 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE BOROUGH OF CHARNWOOD AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE IMPROVEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS.
Maes buddion
BOROUGH OF CHARNWOOD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.