ANCHOR PRESS MUSEUM
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The Anchor Press Museum activity was nil during the past year and is in the process of being wound up due to the inability to fund any progress. All items within the collection and remaining funds in account have been gifted to The St Bride Foundation (Reg. Charity No 207607) and the museum was listed in the London Gazette for striking off on 20th May 2014. Funds in the bank account are now ?0.00.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 28 February 2014
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Essex
Llywodraethu
- 03 Medi 2014: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 207607 ST BRIDE FOUNDATION
- 14 Mai 2001: Cofrestrwyd
- 03 Medi 2014: Tynnwyd (TROSGLWYDDO CRONFEYDD)
- ANCHOR PRESS MUSEUM AND WORKSHOP (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 28/02/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £1 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £15 | £0 | £150 | £1.75k | £3.58k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 28 Chwefror 2014 | 01 Medi 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 28 Chwefror 2014 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2013 | 17 Rhagfyr 2013 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2013 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2012 | 10 Rhagfyr 2012 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2012 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2011 | 20 Mawrth 2012 | 49 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2011 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15TH MARCH 2001
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A. TO PRESERVE AND PROMOTE THE PRINTING HERITAGE OF TIPTREE THAT EXISTED FORM 1900 UNTIL 1980 FOR THE EDUCATION AND LEISURE OF SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC. B. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 ON PRINTING METHODS AND HISTORY THROUGH THE 20TH CENTURY AND OFFER THE ABILITY TO DEMONSTRATE THE TECHNIQUES INVOLVED. C. TO MAINTAIN, REPAIR, RESTORE, PRESERVE, RECONSTRUCT OR RESCUE FROM DESTRUCTION AND NEGLECT ANY ITEMS OF HISTORICAL SIGNIFICANCE RELATING TO PRINTING, BE IT DOCUMENTATION ON TAPE, PAPER OR FILM, OR MACHINERY, TOOLS AND MOVABLE TYPE AND TO KEEP SUCH ITEMS IN A WORKING MUSEUM. THIS WILL BE AVAILABLE FOR ALL MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC, SCHOOLS, COLLEGES, SOCIETIES AND MUSEUM MEMBERS TO ACHIEVE HANDS-ON EXPERIENCE, UNDER SUPERVISION,
Maes buddion
TIPTREE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window