Dogfen lywodraethu ADVANCE BRIGHTER FUTURES

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/08/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/10/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/08/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/11/2014 as amended on 14 Dec 2022 as amended on 06 Dec 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE COUNTY BOROUGH OF WREXHAM SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF MENTAL ILLNESS AND/OR HAVING MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS AND TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO OBTAIN THEIR FULL RIGHTS AND PRIVILEGES AS CITIZENS, BY SUPPORTING AND PROMOTING EMOTIONAL AND PHYSICAL WELLBEING
Maes buddion
COUNTY BOROUGH OF WREXHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.