Dogfen lywodraethu MUSEUM OF POWER
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/05/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/01/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/10/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS REGISTERED IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY ACQUIRING HOUSING AND EXHIBITING AND CONSERVING RESTORING AND REPAIRING OBJECTS AND COLLECTIONS OF AN EDUCATIONAL NATURE AND BY ESTABLISHING ACQUIRING MANAGING AND MAINTAINING MUSEUMS GALLERIES LIBRARIES AND OTHER PLACES WHERE SUCH PURPOSES MAY BE ACHIEVED AND WHERE EDUCATION AND EDUCATIONAL RESEARCH AND ENQUIRY AND THE EXCHANGE AND DISSEMINATION OF RELEVANT VIEWS AND INFORMATION MAY HAPPEN
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED IN GOVERNING DOCUMENT IN PRACTICE LANGFORD AND ULTING IN ESSEX
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.