Dogfen lywodraethu THE NATIONAL VEGETABLE SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 1088979

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1960 AS AMENDED 9.7.1963 8.7.1975. 21.6.1980 21.8.1984 4.7.1987 23.8.1990.94.95. 11.9.1999 26.8.01 & 12.1.13
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CULTIVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF VEGETABLES B) TO ADVANCE KNOWLEDGE OF AN FURTHER PUBLIC INTEREST IN VEGETABLES BY THE PUBLICATION OF INFORMATION, BY EXHIBITION, BY STIMULATING RESEARCH AND EXPERIMENT AND BY AWARDING PRIZES OPEN TO PUBLIC COMPETITION.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NO DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.