ARKWRIGHT SCHOLARSHIPS TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Arkwright Scholarships Trust promotes the rewards of an engineering/technology career to young people through sponsored scholarships. These are funded by industrial companies, various organisations, charitable trusts and interested individuals. Awards are made to high calibre students who plan to study the relevant 'A' level subjects which lead to an engineering degree course and to their schools.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 August 2018
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Gogledd Iwerddon
- Jersey
- Yr Alban
Llywodraethu
- 17 Rhagfyr 2020: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 313719 SMALLPEICE TRUST LIMITED
- 13 Mai 2002: Cofrestrwyd
- 17 Rhagfyr 2020: Tynnwyd (CRONFEYDD WEDI'U TROSGLWYDDO (GI))
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Buddsoddi
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 04/01/2018 | 31/08/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £970.59k | £881.51k | £891.31k | £1.36m | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £903.18k | £1.01m | £1.05m | £1.61m | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o roddion a chymynroddion | £894.49k | £803.73k | £821.21k | £1.28m | N/A | |
|
Incwm o weithgareddau masnachu eraill | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Weithgareddau elusennol | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Gwaddolion | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Buddsoddiad | £15.02k | £14.59k | £10.97k | £7.49k | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Arall | £61.08k | £63.19k | £59.14k | £70.28k | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Cymynroddion | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ggweithgareddau elusennol | £817.43k | £900.10k | £925.21k | £1.41m | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ar godi arian | N/A | N/A | £127.02k | £199.92k | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Llywodraethu | £5.28k | £5.05k | £4.99k | £11.21k | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Sefydliad grantiau | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Rheoli buddsoddiadau | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Arall | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2018 | 30 Mehefin 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2018 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 04 Ionawr 2018 | 15 Tachwedd 2018 | 11 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 04 Ionawr 2018 | 15 Tachwedd 2018 | 11 diwrnod yn hwyr |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/03/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/06/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN GREAT BRITAIN IN THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- (A) IN ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING SCHOLARSHIPS TO BE FROM TIME TO TIME AWARDED TO PERSONS ENTERING A COURSE LEADING TO THE GENERAL CERTIFICATE OF EDUCATION ADVANCED LEVEL EXAMINATIONS (OR ANY EXAMINATIONS DEEMED BY THE TRUSTEES TO BE EQUIVALENT THERETO OR TO HAVE BEEN SUBSTITUTED THEREFOR) IN TECHNOLOGICAL, ENGINEERING AND DESIGN- RELATED SUBJECTS AND WHO HAVE (IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES) EDUCATIONAL OR FINANCIAL NEED FOR SUCH ASSISTANCE; (B) BY MAKING DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS TO SUCH ONE OR MORE OF THE CHARITABLE SCHOOLS COLLEGES UNIVERSITIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS NOW EXISTING OR HEREINAFTER TO EXIST WHICH PROMOTE EDUCATION IN GREAT BRITAIN IN SUCH PROPORTIONS IF MORE THAN ONE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT AND SO THAT ANY DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS MAY BE MADE EITHER FOR THE GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE SCHOOLS COLLEGES UNIVERSITIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS WHERE APPROPRIATE OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS WHERE APPROPRIATE OR FOR ANY SPECIAL CHARITABLE PURPOSE INVOLVING THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; (C) GENERALLY BY SUCH THINGS AS MAY ADVANCE AND ENCOURAGE EDUCATION
Maes buddion
GREAT BRITAIN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window