Dogfen lywodraethu CUCKOOS NEST
Rhif yr elusen: 1090934

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/04/2001 AS AMENDED ON 28/01/2002 AS AMENDED ON 23/06/2004 AS AMENDED ON 05/07/2007 AS AMENDED ON 26/06/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE CUCKOO'S NEST IS TO BENEFIT OR FURTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES, PRIMARILY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF MARSDEN, IN SUCH A MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES, IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION, FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, BY RAISING FUNDS THROUGH THE SALE OF DONATED GOODS.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.