Dogfen lywodraethu HULL AND EAST YORKSHIRE MEDICAL RESEARCH CENTRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/06/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/01/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/03/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/01/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/10/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
ARE TO ESTABLISH AND FUND THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL RESEARCH FACILITIES FOR ENQUIRY INTO THE CAUSES, NATURAL HISTORY, PREVENTION, DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF ILLNESSES AND DISEASES OF ALL KINDS AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. SUCH FACILITIES WILL BE DEVELOPED FOR THE STUDY OF DISEASES OF THE HEART AND CANCERS IN THE FIRST INSTANCE WITH THE ANTICIPATION THAT SIMILAR FACILITIES WILL BE OFFERED TO OTHER SPECIALIST AREAS OF MEDICAL RESEARCH AS THE CENTRE DEVELOPS AND EXPANDS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.