Dogfen lywodraethu THE CASTLE PLAYERS AMATEUR DRAMATIC SOCIETY OF BEAUMARIS
Rhif yr elusen: 1090239
Cyfredol
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 MARCH 2000 AS AMENDED 27 MARCH 2001, 22 MAY 2001, 16 OCTOBER 2001 AND 4 APRIL 2002
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO CULTIVATE AN APPRECIATION OF THEATRICAL ARTS BY PROMOTING THE READING, STUDYING AND PRODUCTION OF WORKS OF ARTISTIC MERIT FOR THE EDUCATIONAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF BEAUMARIS INCLUDING THE MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
BEAUMARIS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.