LITMORE SHAW NATURE TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
As further detailed in the Report of the Trustees for the year ended 31 December 2007 and in note 11 to the Financial Statements for the year ended 31 December 2007, the charities activities were voluntarily discontinued on 3 March 2008 and the company was struck off the Register of Companies on 28 July 2008.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2007
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Bracknell Forest
- Gorllewin Berkshire
- Reading
- Slough
- Swydd Buckingham
- Swydd Rydychen
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Llywodraethu
- 14 Tachwedd 2001: Cofrestrwyd
- 29 Mehefin 2009: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £108.00k | £19 | £28.09k | £39.10k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £63.00k | £141.74k | £38.25k | £46.63k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 27 Awst 2008 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 27 Awst 2008 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2007 | 31 Hydref 2008 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2007 | 31 Hydref 2008 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2006 | 30 Hydref 2007 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2006 | 30 Hydref 2007 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2005 | 31 Hydref 2006 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2005 | 31 Hydref 2006 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2004 | 19 Rhagfyr 2005 | 49 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2004 | 19 Rhagfyr 2005 | 49 diwrnod yn hwyr |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20TH JULY 2001, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 29TH NOVEMBER 2001
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION AND CONSERVATION OF THE NATURAL BEAUTY AND NATURAL HISTORY OF PLANTS AND WILDLIFE BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A PROGRAMME OF RESEARCH INTO AND CONSERVATION OF FLORA, FAUNA AND SPECIES INDIGENOUS TO VARIOUS GEOGRAPHIC AREAS; 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS, PUPILS AND PUBLIC GENERALLY IN THE STUDY OF ENVIRONMENTAL AND ECOLOGICAL ISSUES, IN PARTICULAR BOTANY, CONSERVATION, GRASSLAND MANAGEMENT AND OTHER NATURAL SCIENCES. 3. TO PROMOTE THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT INTO THE DIVERSITY OF PLANT AND ANIMAL LIFE AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; AND 4. TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION OF OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY PROMOTING BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window