Dogfen lywodraethu METABOLIC SUPPORT UK

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/08/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/03/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/01/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/01/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 MAY 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN, YOUNG ADULTS, FAMILY MEMBERS AND CARERS AFFECTED BY METABOLIC DISEASES IN PARTICULAR BY MEANS OF: I) PROVIDING, FOR THE SAME GROUP, AN INFORMATION, ADVICE, AND SUPPORT SERVICE. II) PUTTING, THE SAME GROUP, INTO CONTACT WITH EACH OTHER FOR THEIR MUTUAL BENEFIT, HELP AND SUPPORT. III) THE PROVISION FOR GRANTS AND ALLOWANCES, FOR THE SAME GROUP, AND IN ADDITION TO HOSPITALS, HOMES OR INSTITUTIONS, AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED, FOR THE PURPOSES OF MEDICAL TREATMENT, CARE AND RELIEF FROM SUFFERING. B) THE RELIEF OF ADULTS WHO ARE AFFECTED BY METABOLIC DISEASES BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND SERVICES WHICH ARE NOT OTHERWISE PROVIDED BY ANY OTHER METABOLIC DISEASE GROUP IN ENGLAND AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. C)THE EDUCATION OF HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONALS, OTHER PROFESSIONALS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT METABOLIC DISEASES. D)TO PROVIDE MEDICAL RESEARCH INTO METABOLIC DISEASE AND THEIR DIAGNOSIS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.