Dogfen lywodraethu NATIONAL HIV NURSES ASSOCIATION
Rhif yr elusen: 1099074

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (187 diwrnod yn hwyr)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/05/1998 29.6.2000, 27.06.2002, 26.06.2003, 17/06/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE NURSING PROFESSION ABOUT GOOD NURSING PRACTICES AND TO PROMOTE IMPROVED STANDARDS OF NURSING CARE OF PATIENTS WITH HIV. TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE PROMOTION OF HIV NURSING SKILLS AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.