Dogfen lywodraethu DASH ARTS LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/07/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30/04/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/05/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25/05/2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 03/12/2012 as amended on 21 Mar 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN CONTEMPORARY CULTURE AND OF CROSS-CULTURAL DIALOGUE AND UNDERSTANDING BY MEANS OF THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF PERFORMANCES AND EVENTS OF MULTI-ETHNIC, OR INTERNATIONAL THEATRE, MUSIC, DANCE AND ART
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.