Dogfen lywodraethu KEYFUND FEDERATION LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/03/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/02/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/02/2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 SEP 2017 as amended on 13 Jun 2022 as amended on 23 Sep 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) To advance the education of young people between 11 and 25 years of age in England and Wales by the provision of grants, (training and educational services). (2)To provide recreational and leisure time activities in the interests of social welfare to improve the conditions of life for young persons in the said area who are between 11 and 25 years of age without distinction of political, religious or other opinions in particular by the provision of grants.
Maes buddion
NORTH EAST ENGLAND
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.