Dogfen lywodraethu BINGHAM PENGUINS SWIMMING CLUB
Rhif yr elusen: 1093749

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/04/2001 AS AMENDED ON 17/03/2002 AS AMENDED ON 10/05/2002 AS AMENDED ON 26/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 10/06/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, IN PARTICULAR BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND PROVISION OF A SWIMMING CLUB IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.