Dogfen lywodraethu INSTITUTION OF OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY AND HEALTH BENEVOLENT FUND
Rhif yr elusen: 1090484

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23/09/2001 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 18/12/2009 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 30/04/2014 as amended on 02 Apr 2020 as amended on 03 Jul 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
To relieve hardship amongst current and former members of the Institution and their families and dependants and former employees of the Institution, in accordance with any grant making policy of the Charity.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.