Dogfen lywodraethu SAINTS FOUNDATION (SFC)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 SEPTEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 6 FEBRUARY 2002, 8 MARCH 2004 AND A SPECIAL RESOLUTION APPROVED NAME CHANGE AND REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 OCTOBER 2010. as amended on 16 Sep 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN IN FULL TIME EDUCATION AND DISADVANTAGED ADULTS RESIDING IN THE COUNTY OF HAMPSHIRE AND THE NEIGHBOURING AREA IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF AND LEARNING FROM FOOTBALL.
Maes buddion
HAMPSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.