Dogfen lywodraethu EVERYCHILD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12TH NOVEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED 18TH DECEMBER 2001, 23 OCTOBER 2006 AND 23 SEPTEMBER 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 OCT 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO RELIEVE HARDSHIP POVERTY MALNUTRITION AND SICKNESS (WHETHER PHYSICAL OR MENTAL) OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES; AND 2. TO PROMOTE THE CARE DEVELOPMENT OR EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE; IN BOTH CASES ANYWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD IRRESPECTIVE OF THEIR RELIGION SEX OR RACE OR NATIONAL ORIGIN AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE UNITED NATIONS CONVENTION ON THE RIGHTS OF THE CHILD AND THE UNITED NATIONS DECLARATION ON THE RIGHTS OF THE CHILD (1959) AND TO PROMOTE KNOWLEDGE AND OBSERVANCE OF THAT CONVENTION AND DECLARATION AND 3. SUBJECT THERETO TO CARRY ON SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AS THE CHARITY MAY DETERMINE.
Maes buddion
WORLDWIDE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.