Dogfen lywodraethu ICC MISSIONS

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/08/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/04/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/07/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/01/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/09/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/04/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD; AND 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND THE DISTRESS ARISING THEREFROM OF ANY PERSON WHO IS SUFFERING AS A RESULT OF DROUGHT, EARTHQUAKE, FLOOD OR OTHER NATURAL DISASTER OF WHO BY REASON OF HIS OR HER SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CONDITIONS IS IN NEED OF SUCH ASSISTANCE
Maes buddion
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.