Dogfen lywodraethu SKYWAY CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 5 DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 JULY 2002, CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION CHANGE OF NAME 5 MARCH 2008 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20 APRIL 2009 as amended on 05 Feb 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
SkyWay aims to address the individual needs of disadvantaged young people aged 8-25 years old and their local community in London boroughs; enabling them to achieve personal goals, realise their potential and contribute positively to their community.
Maes buddion
GREATER LONDON - HACKNEY - SHOREDITCH & HAGGERSTON
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.