Dogfen lywodraethu CENTRE FOR MENTAL HEALTH
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/02/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/01/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/06/2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/01/2016 as amended on 26 Jan 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF MENTAL HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND LEARNING IN THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF MENTAL HEALTH CARE; (B) PROMOTING RESEARCH THEREIN AND AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; AND (C) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF MENTAL HEALTH CARE FOR THOSE IN NEED OF SUCH CARE .
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.