Dogfen lywodraethu EQUIPPERS CHURCH

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 MAR 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 FEB 2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 NOV 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18 NOV 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREIN CALLED "THE TRUSTEES") MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Maes buddion
WORLDWIDE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.