Dogfen lywodraethu THE BEACON SCHOOL PARENTS SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 1098878

Mae adrodd yr elusen 1 diwrnod yn hwyr
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 OCTOBER 2002 AS AMENDED 4 JULY 2003 AND 3 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED ON 30 APR 2021 AS AMENDED ON 09 AUG 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE BEACON SCHOOL BY PROVIDING FUNDS,ITEMS,SERVICES AND FACILITIES THAT IT IS NOT THE OBLIGATION OF ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY TO PROVIDE
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.