Dogfen lywodraethu SAFE AND SOUND GROUP
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/04/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/09/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/05/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/08/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/06/2008 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29/04/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/09/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH AND RELIEVE SICKNESS AND POVERTY OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.