Dogfen lywodraethu EROSH, THE NATIONAL CONSORTIUM FOR SHELTERED HOUSING
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/10/2001 AS AMENDED ON 07/02/2003 AS AMENDED ON 08/05/2003 AS AMENDED ON 19/04/2007 AS AMENDED ON 29/03/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: 1. PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PROVISION OF OLDER PERSONS HOUSING AND SERVICES IN ORDER TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF OLDER PEOPLE; AND 2. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF OLDER PEOPLE BY PROMOTING THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES BY CHARITIES AND NON-CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS WITHIN THE OLDER PERSONS HOUSING AND SUPPORT SECTOR
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE IN ENGLAND AND WALES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.