Dogfen lywodraethu CHILD SOLDIERS INTERNATIONAL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/10/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/03/2008 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 03/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09/06/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25 MAY 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE, WORLDWIDE, THE HUMAN RIGHTS ELABORATED IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS (UDHR) AND OTHER INTERNATIONAL AND REGIONAL HUMAN RIGHTS TREATIES AND STANDARDS, INCLUDING THE OPTIONAL PROTOCOL TO THE CONVENTION ON THE RIGHTS OF THE CHILD ON THE INVOLVEMENT OF CHILDREN IN ARMED CONFLICT BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING: 1. ADVOCATING FOR THE ESTABLISHMENTS OF DURABLE MECHANISMS TO PREVENT THE MILITARY RECRUITMENT AND USE OF CHILDREN IN HOSTILITIES, 2. SEEKING THE RELEASE AND REINTEGRATION OF CHILDREN RECRUITED OR USED IN HOSTILITIES, 3. CONTRIBUTING TO OBTAINING REDRESS FOR AND RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN, 4. CARRYING OUT RESEARCH, MONITORING AND PUBLISHING INFORMATION ON THE ABOVE ISSUES AND 5. SUPPORTING LOCAL AND NATIONAL NGOS WORKING WITH AND FOR CHILDREN IN AFFECTED REGIONS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.