Dogfen lywodraethu BRITISH SOCIETY OF ECHOCARDIOGRAPHY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/07/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/10/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/10/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 NOV 2016 as amended on 19 Oct 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE EFFECTIVE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND THE PROMOTION OF BEST PRACTICE IN ECHOCARDIOGRAPHY IN RELATION TO THE DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF HEART DISEASE; B) PROMOTING HIGH STANDARDS OF PROFESSIONAL COMPETENCE IN ECHOCARDIOGRAPHY FOR THE PROTECTION AND BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; C) PROVIDING OR FACILITATING TRAINING FOR THOSE INVOLVED IN THE PRACTICE OF ECHOCARDIOGRAPHY 2) TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE AND CARRY ON STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO ECHOCARDIOGRAPHY AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH; WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE REPUBLIC OF IRELAND
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM AND THE REPUBLIC OF IRELAND
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.