Dogfen lywodraethu REPTON PREPARATORY SCHOOL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 MARCH 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 21 JUNE 2002, 20 JUNE 2003 AND 20 JUNE 2008. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 JUL 2017 as amended on 17 Sep 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE GOVERNORS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING): 1 TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS 2 TO APPLY (IF THE GOVERNORS SO DECIDE) A YEARLY SUM OF NOT LESS THAN Ú500 OUT OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING, OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF REPTON OR ETWALL
Maes buddion
PARISHES OF REPTON AND ETWALL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.