Dogfen lywodraethu NORTH WALES MUSIC TUITION CHARITY
Rhif yr elusen: 1094056
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/07/2002 AS AMENDED ON 20/08/2002 AS AMENDED ON 04/10/2003 AS AMENDED ON 12/05/2006 AS AMENDED ON 14/04/2007 AS AMENDED ON 05/04/2008 AS AMENDED ON 18/04/2009 AS AMENDED ON 26/07/2010 AS AMENDED ON 21/09/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN MUSIC IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF MUSIC TUITION CENTRES, TRAINING AND PUBLIC PERFORMANCE.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE CONWY, DENBIGHSHIRE, FLINTSHIRE AND WREXHAM.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.