Dogfen lywodraethu ROSE THEATRE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23RD AUGUST 1988 AS ALTERED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 2ND JUNE 1989, 5TH JUNE 2000, 7TH OCTOBER 2002 AND 24TH OCTOBER 2002.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PRESERVE THE REMAINS OF THE ROSE THEATRE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK ("THE ROSE THEATRE") AND MAKE THEM ACCESSIBLE TO THE PUBLIC; (B) TO ADVANCE THE GENERAL EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE HISTORY OF THE ROSE THEATRE AND THEATRES AND DRAMAS EXISTING OR CREATED IN THE REIGNS OF THEIR MAJESTIES QUEEN ELIZABETH I AND KING JAMES I OF ENGLAND; (C) TO CARRY OUT RESEARCH INTO THE HISTORY OF THE ROSE THEATRE AND THEATRES AND DRAMAS EXISTING OR CREATED IN THE REIGNS OF THEIR MAJESTIES QUEEN ELIZABETH I AND KING JAMES I OF ENGLAND; AND (D) TO CARRY OUR RESEARCH INTO THE LIVES OF PHILIP HENSLOWE AND HIS CONTEMPORARIES.
Maes buddion
ROSE THEATRE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.