Dogfen lywodraethu JAMIE OLIVER FOOD FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/01/2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/01/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02/07/2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 01/05/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT A. RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT B. ADVANCE EDUCATION C. PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY D. ADVANCE HEALTH E. PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.