Dogfen lywodraethu DERBYSHIRE DISTRICTS CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/05/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/10/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/10/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/06/2013 as amended on 19 Jan 2023 as amended on 16 Nov 2022 as amended on 24 Jan 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The charity’s objects (‘Objects’) are specifically: to promote any charitable purpose for the public benefit by the advancement of education, the protection and preservation of health and the relief of poverty, sickness and distress in particular, but not limited to, for the benefit of the community in Amber Valley, Derbyshire Dales, Erewash, High Peak and surrounding areas.
Maes buddion
THE COMMUNITY IN DERBYSHIRE DALES AND AMBER VALLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.