Dogfen lywodraethu LITTLE OUSE HEADWATERS PROJECT
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/03/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/06/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/12/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/03/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/12/2014 as amended on 29 Nov 2019 as amended on 01 Dec 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE UPPER LITTLE OUSE VALLEY AND ENVIRONS IN THE PARISHES OF REDGRAVE, HINDERCLAY AND THELNETHAM IN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK AND THE PARISHES OF SOUTH LOPHAM AND BLO NORTON IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK.
Maes buddion
THE PARISHES OF REDGRAVE, HINDERCLAY AND THELNETHAM IN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK AND THE PARISHES OF SOUTH LOPHAM AND BLO' NORTON IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.