THE HACKNEY WICK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The Association is a community project ,working to advance the aims, aspiration and wellbeing, of all members in the Wick Ward, London Borough of Hackney
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2007
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Anabledd
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Hackney
Llywodraethu
- 03 Chwefror 2004: Cofrestrwyd
- 31 Ionawr 2014: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £202.08k | £131.35k | £127.06k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £215.06k | £187.34k | £161.54k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2013 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2013 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2012 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2012 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2011 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2011 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2010 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2010 | Heb ei gyflwyno |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 4 FEBRUARY 2002.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1. PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ST MARY IN HACKNEY WICK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY REFERENCE TO THE PLAN ATTACHED AND INCLUDING AN AREA WITHIN THE ST MARY'S PARISH BOUNDARY (THEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE -TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; 3.2. ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND RELATED FACILITIES AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONG OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS; 3.3. PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Maes buddion
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ST MARY IN HACKNEY WICK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window