ARGENTINA IN NEED
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
TO SUPPORT THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN BUENOS AIRES, ARGENTINA,BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO HOGAR EL ALBA ORPHANAGE AND ALSO TO ALLEVIATE POVERTY IN THE INDIGENOUS INDIAN COMMUNITIES OF THE CHACO REGION OF N/ARGENTINA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCE FOR THE SINKING OF WELLS FOR FRESH WATER,AND THE BUILDING OF SCHOOLS AND COMMUNITY FACILITIES
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2012
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Cymorth Dramor/cymorth I’r Newynog
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Ariannin
Llywodraethu
- 17 Chwefror 2003: Cofrestrwyd
- 20 Chwefror 2015: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £6.75k | £5.23k | £3.72k | £3.72k | £3.35k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £9.52k | £3.48k | £3.86k | £4.04k | £3.52k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2014 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2014 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2013 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2013 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2012 | 16 Mawrth 2013 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2012 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2011 | 16 Mawrth 2013 | 136 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2011 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 OCTOBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 12 JANUARY 2003
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN ARGENTINA BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO HOGAR EL ALBA SCHOOL AND ESCUELA CRISTIANA EVANGELICA ARGENTINA BURZACO. 2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN SALTA, ARGENTINA PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT TO THE SOUP KITCHEN AND HOLGA EL ALBA ORPHANAGE AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES (AS DEFINED BY THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES) WITHIN ARGENTINA, AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE..
Maes buddion
SALTA, ARGENTINA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window