Dogfen lywodraethu SHARED LIVES PLUS LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/08/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/09/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/11/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/11/2014 as amended on 10 Sep 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ASSIST AND RELIEVE DISABLED PEOPLE, OR VULNERABLE OR DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE, WHO ARE IN NEED BECAUSE OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING), IN RELATION TO THEIR ACCOMMODATION, CARE AND SUPPORT.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.